Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sacramento Municipal Utility District, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stephanie L Quinn, against Velez, Daniel, Does 1-5, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time4037 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: December 31, 2008Declaration - Other (Brief Summary of the Case [CRC Rule 388(a)(1)]) filed.
Date: October 15, 2008Declaration - Other (Julie Strode in Support of Request For Entry of Court Judgment) filed.
Date: October 15, 2008Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: October 15, 2018Does 1 - 5 Dismissed
Date: 2008-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: October 15, 2018Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-06-12T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-06-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Judgment By Court After Default) filed.
Date: 2008-10-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-10-15T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: January 15, 2009Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 20, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: November 01, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.