Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mek Arden Llc, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by James F Geary, against Does 1-20, California Department Of Public Health, represented by Barbara Haukedalen, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1168 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1196 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-10-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 04/28/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-04-28T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application/Stipulation (CMP) - Other (Extend Time to Select Trial) filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2009-02-02T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2008-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-02-02T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/28/2010 09:00:00 AM published .
Date: 2010-04-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 12, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-10-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-06-18T00:00:00General Denial filed.
Date: 2008-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2009-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Trial filed.
Date: 2009-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial) filed.
Date: 2009-11-20T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Continue MSC) filed.
Date: 2010-03-30T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (Settlement Conference and Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2010-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2011-03-23T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Continue MSC) filed.
Date: 2011-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: August 09, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.