Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shasta Cascade Credit Bureaus Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Troy M Wilkinson, against Does 1-100, Caravelli, Joe, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 16, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions85 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time257 days |
Declaration - Other (Plaintiffs Declaration Requesting Interest) filed.
Date: July 10, 2008Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: July 10, 2008Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed.
Date: 2008-04-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-04-16T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-04-16T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: October 30, 2008Writ of Execution (Stanislaus) Issued
Date: October 30, 2008Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: July 10, 2008Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-07-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.