Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Target National Bank vs. Irene E Foster
On April 14, 2008 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 14, 2008
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
10 years, 7 months and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed. |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Application for Renewal of Judgment filed. |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied (Sacramento) filed. |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Issued) Issued |
|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Foster, Irene E on Complaint. | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (For Reimbursement of Costs) filed. |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (In Support Default Judgment, Attorneys Fees and Costs, Copies in Lieu of Originals) filed. |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Waiver of Interest & Attorneys Fees Declaration) filed. |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/06/2008 . | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/17/2008 . | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 44 . | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|