Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian N Winn, against Does 1-10, Lima, Damian J., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 14, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions172 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1778 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: February 25, 2013Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: October 03, 2008Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-04-14T00:00:00Declaration of Diligent Search filed.
Date: 2008-04-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-04-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-04-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: October 03, 2008Declaration - Other (re: Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2008-10-03T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 27, 2009Declaration - Other (re: Underlying Action of Account Stated) filed.
Date: 2008-10-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Issued (Los Angeles)) Issued
Date: November 05, 2010Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-10-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.