Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Indymac Bank Fsb, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Michael A Wallin, against Bardis, Christo, Bardis, Rachel, Corinthian Homes, Does 1-100, Palmbaum, Bruce, (total of 7) See All represented by Peter J Pullen, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Loren E. McMaster presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 16, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions448 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time503 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2008-06-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: July 08, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-04-16T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-07-16T00:00:00Motion - Other (to Discharge Receiver) filed.
Date: August 03, 2009Request - Other (Nomination of Thomas A Seaman as receiver) filed.
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Receiver and Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-11-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/01/2009 02:00:00 PM .
Date: September 01, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-05-12T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-05-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-04-16T00:00:00Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing filed.
Date: 2008-10-22T00:00:00Affidavit - Other (Oath of Receiver) filed.
Date: 2008-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Undertaking Posted filed.
Date: 2008-08-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for All Proceedings Stayed heard on 11/10/2008 04:02:04 PM .
Date: 2008-11-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Thomas Seaman) filed.
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2009-02-25T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2008-12-05T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Recording of Receivers Grant of Lien 1) filed.
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.