Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Shawn Hawk vs. California Department of Corrections Board of Parole Hearings
On April 10, 2008 a writ of mandate case was filed by Hawk, Shawn, against California Department Of Corrections Board Of Parole Hearings, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Timothy M. Frawley presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 10, 2008
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
4 years, 4 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution . | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate disposed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution . | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution . | |
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Petition for Lack of Timely Prosecution |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Order - Other (OSC Re: Dismissal for Lack of Timely Prosecution) filed. |
|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate filed. |
|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Correspondence filed. |
|
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Request - Other (for Grant of Writ of Mandate) filed. |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Correspondence |
|
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Reissuance of Alternative Writ |
|
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Request - Other (for Reissuance of Alternative Writ) filed. |
|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order - denying Request for Order of Default |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Default & Request for Issuance of Writ of Mandate) filed. |
|
November 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. |
|
November 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice - Other filed. |
|
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Alternative Writ of Mandate California Department of Corrections Board of Prison Hearings | |
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 11/07/2008 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 29 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard on 11/04/2008 01:28:02 PM . |
|
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Alternative Writ of Mandate |
|
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 11/07/2008 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 29 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Request - Other filed. |
|
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing filed. |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Correspondence filed. |
|
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Hawk, Shawn Application for Waiver granted by operation of law . | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Correspondence filed. |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs (In Forma Pauperis) generated . |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Hawk, Shawn Application for Waiver granted in full . | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 29 . | |
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver - Granted by Operation of Law filed. |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|