Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Luu, Linh, Lee, Janette, Lee, Anika, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David G Crowdis, John Lee, against Strong, Jed Wilson, Strong, Araceli, Does 1-25, represented by Thomas H Smith, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 14, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions822 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time822 days |
Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2008-10-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 15, 2010Stipulation for Settlement
Date: June 30, 2010Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-10-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-01-04T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-04-14T00:00:00Award of Arbitrator filed.
Date: 2009-01-16T00:00:00Stipulation for Settlement
Date: 2009-08-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Arbitrator Selection Call-in heard on 10/06/2008 01:47:00 PM .
Date: 2008-10-06T00:00:00Agreement to Serve as Arbitrator filed.
Date: 2008-11-13T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-06-03T00:00:00Rejection of Arbitration Award and Request for Trial De Novo filed.
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00Order - Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2008-04-15T00:00:00Summons Returned filed.
Date: 2008-04-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-04-14T00:00:00Order - Guardian At Litem (Janette Lee)
Date: 2008-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator
Date: 2008-10-27T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2008-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2008-11-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 02/19/2009 11:10:15 AM .
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2009-09-01T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2009-02-20T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates) filed.
Date: 2009-03-18T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed.
Date: March 11, 2010Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: June 30, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.