Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CACH LLC vs. Toyoko N Keidel
On April 02, 2008 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 02, 2008
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 8 months and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued |
|
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration In Support of Judgment) filed. |
|
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration In Support of Interest CCP 2015.5) filed. |
|
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
February 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Keidel, Toyoko N on Complaint . | |
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed. |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 44 . | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/03/2008 . | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|