Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Trotter, Mark, Nissen, Lisa, Lisa Nissen As Successors In Interest Of John Trotter Decedent, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Jessica J Snyder, against Mariner Health Care Management Company, Grancare Llc, Does 1-50, represented by Marc Katz, Stephen J. Kelley, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1074 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1125 days |
Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2010-10-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/25/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-10-25T00:00:00Notice-Order to Show Cause Sanction Notice
Date: 2008-11-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Exparte Application
Date: 2009-09-17T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (Separate (set 2)) submitted by Grancare LLC rejected on 09/30/2010 .
Date: 2010-09-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Statement of Damages filed.
Date: 2008-05-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2009-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Order Temporarily Staying Sept 10 2010 Court Order) filed.
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Statement - Other (separarte in opposition) filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/18/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-10-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Wnedy C. York in Support of) filed.
Date: 2009-09-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Non-California) filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-05-23T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate in opposition) filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter Re: Sanctions) filed.
Date: 2008-12-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time) filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Statement - Other (in support of motion to compel responses to special interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Statement - Other (in support of motion to compel responses to production of documents) filed.
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2009-09-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of J Barrios submitted in support) filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Order granting exparte application
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended of Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories Set Three) filed.
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Lodging of original declarations in support) filed.
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Statement - Other (in support of opposition to motion to compel) filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (lodging of original declarations in support of opposition) filed.
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2010-10-13T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Of Order) filed.
Date: 2009-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-10-01T00:00:00Motion - Other (For Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2010-09-22T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application and Supporting Documents
Date: 2009-04-21T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex parte Application
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2010-09-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Wendy C. York in Support of) filed.
Date: 2009-04-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 24, 2011Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-05-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-03-28T00:00:00Default denied as to Mariner Health Care Management Company on Complaint .
Date: 2008-05-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-05-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/20/2009 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2009-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-05-20T00:00:00Returned Document Form - Re: Default Request
Date: 2008-05-19T00:00:00Default denied as to Mariner Health Care Management Company on Complaint .
Date: 2008-05-20T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Time and Place of Trial filed.
Date: 2008-12-08T00:00:00Stipulation to continue trial; Order
Date: 2009-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2010-06-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (responses to special interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (compel deposition of Patricia Enos) filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Trial Date and Mandatory Settlement Conference Date) filed.
Date: 2009-05-29T00:00:00Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of Patricia Enos) filed.
Date: 2010-08-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support of opposition to motion to compel deposition) filed.
Date: 2010-08-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Deposition Testimony of Patricia Enos) filed.
Date: 2010-08-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (further responses and production of documents) filed.
Date: 2010-09-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (to Compel Deposition Testimony of Patricia Enos) filed.
Date: 2010-09-01T00:00:00Motion - Other (for protective order RE deposition of Stephen J Kelley) filed.
Date: 2010-09-23T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Continue MSC) filed.
Date: 2010-10-05T00:00:00Court Approval of Letter Request to Continue from 10/12/10 to 10/14/10.
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2010-10-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed.
Date: 2010-10-04T00:00:00Correspondence (Settlement Conference Confirmation) filed.
Date: 2010-09-15T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2010-10-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.