Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Casey, Timothy L., Does 1 - 10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 02, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions260 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time260 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: December 08, 2008Complaint filed.
Date: April 02, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: April 02, 2008Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: November 25, 2008Summons filed.
Date: 2008-04-02T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: October 24, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.