Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Florin Resource Conservation District, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by William E. Robinson, against Union Bank Of California Na, Does 1-600, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions225 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time228 days |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: September 15, 2008Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 12, 2008Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: September 11, 2008Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-01-31T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-01-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-01-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.