Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Professional Credit Control, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Andre J Lelievre, against First Nationwide Realty Inc, Does 1-20, Cook, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions190 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time413 days |
Statement - Other (Summary of the Case) filed.
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-08-08T00:00:00Statement - Other (Computation of Interest) filed.
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-01-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: 2008-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-08-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-01-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-01-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-08-08T00:00:00Returned Document - Request for Entry of Default/Clerk's Judgment and supporting documents (03/13/08)
Date: 2008-09-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-03-13T00:00:00Request for Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Justin Lane) filed.
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-09-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.