Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Investment Retrievers Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jeffrey Flettrick, against Does 1-10, Danielson, Kent, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions612 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1120 days |
Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2009-02-03T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2009-02-04T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-03-13T00:00:00Returned Document - Request for Entry of Default/Clerk's Judgment and Supporting Documents
Date: 2008-09-23T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Lajuan E Wood Waiving Excess Attorney's Fees) filed.
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: February 19, 2010Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: 2009-10-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does - Default Judgment Pending filed.
Date: 2009-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-02-06T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment submitted by Investment Retrievers Inc rejected on 04/20/2010 .
Date: April 20, 2010Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 01, 2010Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: August 18, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 24, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.