Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Trent, John D., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions173 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time179 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: June 13, 2008Complaint filed.
Date: December 27, 2007Summons filed.
Date: December 27, 2007Declaration - Other filed.
Date: December 27, 2007Declaration of Diligent Search filed.
Date: January 16, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: June 23, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.