Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Turner, Shelby, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions211 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3854 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Statement - Other (Chain of Title & Billing Statements) filed.
Date: January 28, 2009Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: July 16, 2018Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Venue) filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: January 28, 2009Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: January 28, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-01-03T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does - Default Judgment Pending filed.
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Application - Other (For Interest Costs & Atty Fees) filed.
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: May 20, 2009Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 20, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.