Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank National Association Nd, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Amy L Gordon, against Gilman, Barbara C., Does 1 - 20, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2265 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: March 10, 2014Declaration - Other (of Attorney in Support of Court Costs Pursuant to CCP 1033b) filed.
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Attorney in Support of Calculation of Interest) filed.
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Judgment CCP 585d) filed.
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence filed.
Date: 2008-01-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-01-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Waiving Attorneys Fees) filed.
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: December 08, 2008Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: January 07, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 08, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.