Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
First Resolution Investment Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stephen S Zeller, against Does 1-20, Finley, Dianna L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions280 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2063 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Attorneys In Support of Calculation of Interest) filed.
Date: October 14, 2008Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Attorney In Support Of Court Costs Pursuant To CCP 1033(b)) filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-05-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-05-28T00:00:00Default denied as to Finley, Dianna L on Complaint .
Date: 2008-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-01-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Waiving Attorneys Fees) filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: November 25, 2008Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: July 01, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: March 19, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.