Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Physician, One Unnamed, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Regents Of The University Of California, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael P. Kenny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Kenny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2297 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2300 days |
Correspondence (Letter dated 04/04/2014 RE OSC RE Dismissal) filed.
Date: April 08, 2014Minute Order - Ex Parte Application for Alternative Writ
Date: 2008-01-03T00:00:00Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Application - Other filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Order - Other (Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal) filed.
Date: February 13, 2014Reassignment of Case to Judge Kenny for All Purposes
Date: 2008-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment
Date: 2008-09-03T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Case reassigned to 19 effective 12/27/2007 .
Date: 2007-12-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2007-12-27T00:00:00Notice - Other (Unavailability of Counsel) filed.
Date: 2008-03-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2008-03-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: October 06, 2008Order After Hearing (Order of Dismissal) filed.
Date: April 11, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.