Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carreon, Erika, Carreon, Victor, Pantoja, Gloria G., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael R Loewen, against Doe Repair Shop, Feaster, Christine, Feaster, Norman, represented by Ann Marie Defelice, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 06, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions589 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1008 days |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 07, 2010Agreement to Serve as Arbitrator filed.
Date: 2008-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: August 05, 2010Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2009-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-07-09T00:00:00Judgment in Arbitration Proceedings
Date: 2009-07-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Appl to Extend Arb - GRTD 11/13/08
Date: 2008-11-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Failure to Comply
Date: 2009-02-20T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-12-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Extend Arbitration Date filed.
Date: 2008-11-06T00:00:00Exparte Application to Extend Arbitration Date (Granted)
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/31/2009 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2009-08-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Extend Arbitration Date filed.
Date: 2009-03-18T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00Refund Request filed.
Date: August 23, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-06T00:00:00Award of Arbitrator filed.
Date: 2009-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-07-03T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Trial and Settlement COnference) filed.
Date: 2010-03-10T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-02-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-06T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2008-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator
Date: 2008-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2008-11-06T00:00:00Notice Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings generated .
Date: 2008-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: June 28, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.