Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allstate Insurance, filed a(n) Subrogation - Insurance case represented by Bolinger - Associates, against Cheatham, Helen, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2004 |
CategorySubrogation: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeSubrogation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
March 10, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
March 05, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
March 05, 2004 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
March 05, 2004 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
February 11, 2004 | Docket Event | Default/Prove up Hearing | |
January 14, 2004 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 19, 2003 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 10, 2003 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
October 30, 2003 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.