Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wheaton, Perry William, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Meza, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2004 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 04, 2005 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
July 01, 2004 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
March 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Petition | |
March 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
January 29, 2004 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
January 06, 2004 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.