Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rains, Esq., Jennifer filed a(n) Vc - Veterans Court case against Fisher, Jason Michael, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2012 |
CategoryVc - Veterans Court |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2014 | Hearing |
H280 - SC-Graduation D290 - SC-Graduated/Dismissed filed on: 01/08/2014 Extra Text: DEFENDANT GRADUATED. COURT INDICATED THE MATTER WOULD BE TAKEN UP THE FOLLOWING WEEK AS THE DEFENDANT WAS A TRANSFER FROM CARSON CITY. PD AGREED WITH THE COURT. Judge: PETER BREEN |
|
December 18, 2013 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 12/18/2013 Extra Text: Judge: PETER BREEN |
|
December 11, 2013 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 12/11/2013 Extra Text: Judge: ROBERT ROSE |
|
December 04, 2013 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 12/04/2013 Extra Text: Judge: PETER BREEN |
|
November 27, 2013 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 11/27/2013 Extra Text: Judge: PETER BREEN |
|
November 20, 2013 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 11/20/2013 Extra Text: Judge: PETER BREEN |
|
November 13, 2013 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 11/13/2013 Extra Text: Judge: SCOTT JORDAN |
|
November 06, 2013 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 11/06/2013 Extra Text: Judge: ARCHIE BLAKE |
|
October 30, 2013 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 10/30/2013 Extra Text: Judge: ARCHIE BLAKE |
|
October 23, 2013 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 10/23/2013 Extra Text: Judge: ARCHIE BLAKE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.