Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with PROB. COMM. GORMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePROB. COMM. GORMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2024 |
CategorySu - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10192328 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-01-2024:11:27:40 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
1040P - Affidavit of Mailing - PR Transaction 10192304 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-01-2024:11:25:17 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
1110 - Amended Pet ... AMENDED PETITION FOR PROBATE OF ESTATE, FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION AND FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - Transaction 10190756 - Approved By: ADIXON : 02-29-2024:15:34:44 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10190785 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-29-2024:15:37:30 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10182735 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-27-2024:10:12:27 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 2/21/2024: Petition to Appoint Administrator - Transaction 10182728 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-27-2024:10:11:25 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10173234 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2024:08:00:03 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing HEARING - MARCH 13, 2024 AT 1PM Transaction 10173637 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2024:09:30:02 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10174230 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2024:11:46:47 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10173729 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2024:09:54:14 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.