Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with PROB. COMM. GORMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePROB. COMM. GORMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2022 |
CategoryFa - General Administration |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10099458 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-16-2024:13:07:50 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing HEARING - JANUARY 31, 2024 AT 10AM Transaction 10099438 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-16-2024:13:03:07 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
1040P - Affidavit of Mailing - PR Transaction 10099440 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-16-2024:13:06:33 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10099441 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-16-2024:13:06:34 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10096815 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-12-2024:15:21:29 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
3530 - Pet Final Distribution Transaction 10096814 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-12-2024:15:20:59 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10087300 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-09-2024:10:38:17 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
2608 - Notice of Non-Compliance Transaction 10087292 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-09-2024:10:37:34 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9671881 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-17-2023:12:03:52 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9671877 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-17-2023:12:03:09 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.