Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2022 |
CategoryTn - Trust/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 12/14/2022: Petition to Appoint Trust Protector - Transaction 9422052 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-21-2022:19:41:15 |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9422053 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-21-2022:19:41:34 |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 9416743 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-19-2022:13:38:41 |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9416748 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-19-2022:13:39:33 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
2745 - Ord Appointing ... ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUST PROTECTOR - Transaction 9414890 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-16-2022:15:59:45 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9414899 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-16-2022:16:00:27 |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
December 14, 2022 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG D425 - Granted filed on: 12/14/2022 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/COURTROOM B/RBRANUM 12/14/2022: Petition to Appoint Trust Protector Kalicki Collier, LLP, and any lawful successor thereto, is hereby appointed as the successor Trust Protector of the Daniel Medvene Irrevocable Trust Dated October 5, 2021 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
December 14, 2022 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of $505.00 was made on receipt DCDC705342. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.