Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reed, David Thomas, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategorySe - Set Aside |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5965422 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-24-2017:08:52:12 |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
3240 - Ord Set Aside Est w/o Admin ORDER SETTING ASIDE ESTATE WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION - Transaction 5965412 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-24-2017:08:49:25 |
|
February 22, 2017 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN D425 - Granted filed on: 02/22/2017 Extra Text: JAVS/COURTROOM B/M.CONWAY 02/22/2017: Petition to Set Aside Estate without Administration. Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 02/22/2017: Petition to Set Aside Estate without Administration. - Transaction 5962302 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2017:15:26:35 |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5962309 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2017:15:27:32 |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5957979 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-21-2017:08:28:02 |
|
February 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service Amended - Transaction 5957769 - Approved By: YLLOYD : 02-21-2017:08:27:06 |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5956823 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-17-2017:12:29:07 |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service Transaction 5956821 - Approved By: PMSEWELL : 02-17-2017:12:28:08 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.