Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frey, Ruth J. filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2015 |
CategorySu - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
2530 - Notice of Entry of Decree -Ruth Frey - Transaction 6023069 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-29-2017:12:33:33 |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6023073 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-29-2017:12:36:25 |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
1535 - Decree of Discharge Transaction 6016207 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-24-2017:11:05:09 |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6016210 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-24-2017:11:06:07 |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission Transaction 6012981 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 03-22-2017:15:58:57 DOCUMENT TITLE: DECREE OF DISCHARGE APPROVING THE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE PARTY SUBMITTING: DAVID J. REESE ESQ DATE SUBMITTED: MAR 22, 2017 SUBMITTED BY: YVILORIA DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6012999 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-22-2017:16:00:09 |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6012781 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-22-2017:15:11:49 |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
3515 - Pet for Discharge Frey Estate - Transaction 6012773 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 03-22-2017:15:10:55 |
|
March 22, 2017 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 03/24/2017 Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5971729 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-28-2017:13:42:26 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.