Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mulligan, Esq., John B. filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryFa - General Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5028611 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-02-2015:11:10:42 |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 5028604 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-02-2015:11:09:47 |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5021478 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-29-2015:10:54:59 |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
1535 - Decree of Discharge ORDER FOR DISCHARGE - Transaction 5021472 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-29-2015:10:53:59 |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
3735 - Receipt MITZI JO WATTERS' RECEIPT FOR REIMBURSED EXPENSES OF THE STATE - Transaction 5016801 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 06-25-2015:10:11:53 |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5017079 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-25-2015:10:12:51 |
|
June 23, 2015 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 06/29/2015 Extra Text: PETITION OF CO-SPECIAL ADMINISTRATORS FOR APPROVAL AND AUTHORITY TO SETTLE WRONGFUL DEATH CLAIM Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5012431 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-23-2015:09:36:42 |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5012174 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-23-2015:08:24:07 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.