Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wc Public Admin, Don Cavallo filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategorySl - Special Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4856806 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-12-2015:08:24:50 |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher VOUCHER FOR RENOWN REGIONAL MED CTR - $1,000 - Transaction 4856346 - Approved By: YLLOYD : 03-12-2015:08:23:47 |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
1635 - Distributee's Receipt DISTRIBUTEE'S RECEIPT FOR MARGARET ANN MEHAL HUGHES - $4,971.29 - Transaction 4856346 - Approved By: YLLOYD : 03-12-2015:08:23:47 |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher VOUCHER FOR CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS - $25.21 - Transaction 4856346 - Approved By: YLLOYD : 03-12-2015:08:23:47 |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher VOUCHER FOR RENO RADIOLOGICAL ASSOC - $59.00 - Transaction 4856346 - Approved By: YLLOYD : 03-12-2015:08:23:47 |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4831814 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-24-2015:15:11:19 |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
1635 - Distributee's Receipt DISTRIBUTEE'S RECEIPT FROM DANIEL HEDLUND - $1,510.00 - Transaction 4831468 - Approved By: MCHOLICO : 02-24-2015:15:10:20 |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4775926 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-15-2015:14:48:54 |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher VOUCHER FROM NV ENERGY - $36.80 - Transaction 4775447 - Approved By: MELWOOD : 01-15-2015:14:47:58 |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher VOUCHER FROM SIERRA CREST SENIOR APARTMENT HOMES - $41.32 - Transaction 4766999 - Approved By: MELWOOD : 01-09-2015:11:37:06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.