Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzalez, Severino Teofilo, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryFa - General Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
1535 - Decree of Discharge Transaction 772132 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-14-2009:10:20:54 |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
F300 - Final Distribution DECREE OF DISCHARGE, MAY 14, 2009 |
|
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher Transaction 749809 - Approved By: AZION : 05-04-2009:14:50:22 |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
3515 - Pet for Discharge EXPARTE PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISCHARGE - Transaction 741531 - Approved By: AZION : 04-29-2009:16:50:10 |
|
April 29, 2009 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 05/14/2009 Extra Text: DECREE OF DISCHARGE, MAY 14, 2009 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission EXPARTE PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISCHARGE - Transaction 741531 - Approved By: AZION : 04-29-2009:16:50:10 DOCUMENT TITLE: EXPARTE PETITION FOR DECREE OF DISCHARGE PARTY SUBMITTING: RYAN J. EARL ESQ DATE SUBMITTED: 04-29-09 SUBMITTED BY: AZION DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher Transaction 698134 - Approved By: AZION : 04-08-2009:10:21:13 |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher DISTRIBUTEE'S VOUCHER - SEVERINO T. CONZALEZ ACKNOWLEDGES RECEIPT OF $114,616.82 - Transaction 693365 - Approved By: LMATHEUS : 04-06-2009:15:46:15 |
|
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher DISTRIBUTEE'S VOUCHER - Transaction 684465 - Approved By: AZION : 04-01-2009:13:54:35 |
|
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
4260 - Voucher Transaction 684465 - Approved By: AZION : 04-01-2009:13:54:35 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.