Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Coop, Frederick Eugene filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategorySu - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 4573803 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-22-2014:11:52:40 |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4573806 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-22-2014:11:53:30 |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
2795 - Ord Closing Estate DECREE OF FINAL DISCHARGE - Transaction 4572108 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-21-2014:14:31:45 |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4572110 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-21-2014:14:32:45 |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4570668 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-20-2014:16:16:55 |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 7/10/14 - PET/CONF/SALE/REAL/PROP - Transaction 4570656 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-20-2014:16:15:41 |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF FINAL DISCHARGE AND DECREE OF FINAL DISCHARGE (NO PAPER ORDER PROVIDED) - Transaction 4565406 - Approved By: MFERNAND : 08-18-2014:10:07:15 PARTY SUBMITTING: RODNEY E. SUMPTER, ESQ. DATE SUBMITTED: 08/18/2014 SUBMITTED BY: M. FERNANDEZ DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4565431 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-18-2014:10:08:50 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.