Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Carson, Lisa Ann filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamatha R. Schreinert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2024 |
CategoryGb - Guardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10252615 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-02-2024:11:12:33 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
3366 - Ord Vacating SUA SPONTE ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN - Transaction 10252611 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-02-2024:11:11:39 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE OF ELY SHOSHONE TRIBAL COURT ORDER DETERMINING JURISDICTION - Transaction 10250325 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-01-2024:11:53:36 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10250328 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-01-2024:11:54:25 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
3835 - Report... RE: MEDIATION - Transaction 10242927 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-27-2024:14:55:23 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10242932 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-27-2024:14:55:59 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
3835 - Report... PRELIMINARY INVESTIGATIVE REPORT Transaction 10225151 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-18-2024:18:08:07 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10225153 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-18-2024:18:08:46 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE OF MEDIATION BY AUDIO VISUAL MEANS - Transaction 10218383 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-14-2024:14:41:30 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10218391 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-14-2024:14:42:32 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.