Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Meier, Esq., Krista D. filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with WALKER, EGAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
CategoryGa - Guardianship Of An Adult |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Hearing |
HP25 - REPORT TO COURT - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: FRANCES DOHERTY |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
4075 - Substitution of Counsel DFX: DUPLICATE FILING Transaction 8496202 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-15-2021:13:33:33 |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8496204 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-15-2021:13:34:23 |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
4075 - Substitution of Counsel DANA SISK, ESQ IN PLACE OF KRISTA MEIER, ESQ FOR PROTECTED PERSON - Transaction 8494741 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-14-2021:16:16:16 |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8494748 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-14-2021:16:17:14 |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8376975 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-05-2021:10:06:59 |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
3243 - Ord Setting Required 3 Yr Review Hrg Transaction 8376972 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-05-2021:10:06:10 |
|
April 01, 2021 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 04/05/2021 Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission Transaction 8372509 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-01-2021:10:36:13 DOCUMENT TITLE: ANNUAL REPORT OF GUARDIAN ON CONDITION OF PROTECED PERSON FILED APRIL 1, 2021 PARTY SUBMITTING: DANIA REID ESQ DATE SUBMITTED: 4-1-21 SUBMITTED BY: YV DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
1125 - Annual Report of Guardian Transaction 8372509 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-01-2021:10:36:13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.