Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Balintec, Liezl C. filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2012 |
CategoryGb - Guardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
2777 - Ord Approving ... 07-29-22 - Order Approving Review Hearing - Transaction 9177540 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-29-2022:10:39:53 |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9177542 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-29-2022:10:40:40 |
|
July 29, 2022 | Hearing |
H788 - REVIEW HEARING D260 - Continue Present Status filed on: 07/29/2022 Extra Text: JAVS/C4/KJOSEPH Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
3243 - Ord Setting Required 3 Yr Review Hrg Transaction 9128404 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-01-2022:08:53:41 |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9128412 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-01-2022:08:54:25 |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8935816 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-09-2022:10:58:08 |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
2777 - Ord Approving ... ORDER APPROVING ANNUAL REPORT - Transaction 8935811 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-09-2022:10:57:29 |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
1125 - Annual Report of Guardian Extra Text: |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: ANNUAL REPORT OF GUARDIAN OF A MINOR PARTY SUBMITTING: TEREZITA BALINTEC DATE SUBMITTED: 02/011/2022 SUBMITTED BY: MSALAZAR DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
February 11, 2022 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 03/09/2022 Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.