Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Montgomery, Mary N filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with WALKER, EGAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALKER, EGAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategoryGa - Guardianship Of An Adult |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
3265 - Ord Terminate Guardianship ORDER TERMINATING GUARDIANSHIP AND CLOSING CASE - Transaction 970388 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-14-2009:13:35:59 |
|
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
F280 - Guard: Death Extra Text: |
|
August 13, 2009 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 08/14/2009 Extra Text: ORDER TERMINATING GUARDIANSHIP AND CLOSING CASE Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: PETITION TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP AS A RESULT OF WARD'S DEATH PARTY SUBMITTING: PATRICIA F. WINNIE, ESQ. DATE SUBMITTED: 08/12/09 SUBMITTED BY: JSHEETS DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
3635 - Pet to Terminate Guardianship PETITION TO TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP AS A RESULT OF THE WARD'S DEATH - Transaction 918564 - Approved By: ASMITH : 07-23-2009:10:43:06 |
|
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL WITHDRAWAL OF BRIAN DAVENPORT FOR JOHN MONTGOMERY Cg |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
1125 - Annual Report of Guardian Extra Text: |
|
April 10, 2008 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 05/14/2008 Extra Text: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (BRIAN DAVENPORT FOR THE WARD) Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: ORDER ALLOWING FOR WITHDRAWAL OF LEGAL COUNSEL PARTY SUBMITTING: BRIAN L. DAVENPORT, ESQ. DATE SUBMITTED: 04/10/08 SUBMITTED BY: JSHEETS DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
1360 - Certificate of Service Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.