Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Mcneil, Grace Alyce, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2024 |
CategoryNm - Name Change - Minor |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10275388 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-15-2024:14:06:04 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
1067 - Affidavit/Declaration of Service KATHRYNE SMITH 04/10/2024 - Transaction 10275382 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-15-2024:14:05:28 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10254636 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-03-2024:08:44:34 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10254525 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-03-2024:07:54:31 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... AMENDED NOTICE OF PETITION FOR MINOR NAME CHANGE - Transaction 10254635 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-03-2024:08:44:08 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
3490 - Pet for Change of Name AMENDED - Transaction 10254424 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 04-03-2024:07:53:36 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
1639 - **Document Issued by the Court AMENDED - Transaction 10254424 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 04-03-2024:07:53:36 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing 4/16/2024 @ 1:30PM - Transaction 10243199 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-27-2024:15:43:32 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10243218 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-27-2024:15:45:26 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
1639 - **Document Issued by the Court NOTICE OF PET FOR MINOR CHANGE OF NAME - Transaction 10229492 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 03-20-2024:13:38:09 Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.