Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHANNON, MASTER GREG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2022 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | Hearing |
H353 - FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY D845 - Vacated filed on: 01/05/2023 Extra Text: Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9441454 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-05-2023:14:37:57 |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
4240 - Vacate Sheet 10:40AM 01/10/2023Transaction 9441443 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-05-2023:14:34:42 |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing 01/10/2023 10:40AM Transaction 9402602 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-09-2022:14:42:16 |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9402603 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-09-2022:14:42:44 |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service Transaction 9396567 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-07-2022:11:46:24 |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9396585 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-07-2022:11:47:41 |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
2504 - Notice/Find/Finan/Prntl/Respon NOTICE AND FINDING OF FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY - Transaction 9381384 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 11-29-2022:08:50:35 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.