Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCu - Custody (Non-Divorce) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | Hearing |
H320 - HEARING ON EX PARTE FILING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: EX PARTE MOTION REGARDING A TEMPORARY PROTECTION ORDER PARTY SUBMITTING: VICTORIA BEAULIEU DATE SUBMITTED: 10/7/21 10/11/21 SUBMITTED BY: JBYE DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
October 19, 2021 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing ORDER SETTING HEARING; ORDER TO FILE; INTERIM ORDER RE: VISITATION - Transaction 8697945 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-14-2021:11:56:05 |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8697949 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-14-2021:11:57:07 |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8695098 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-13-2021:11:07:11 |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
2700 - Ord After Hearing... Transaction 8695092 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-13-2021:11:06:21 |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: EX PARTE EMERGENCY MOTION REGARDING CHILDREN PARTY SUBMITTING: VICTORIA BEAULIEU DATE SUBMITTED: 10/11/21 SUBMITTED BY: JBYE DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
October 11, 2021 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 10/12/2021 Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8682879 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-05-2021:19:15:04 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.