Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramirez Filorio, Adriana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mateos, Juan Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Chuck Weller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChuck Weller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryCu - Custody (Non-Divorce) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 6046746 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-12-2017:09:54:15 |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6046752 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-12-2017:09:55:18 |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
2867 - Ord Estab Cust/Visitation... Transaction 6046702 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-12-2017:09:42:24 |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6046710 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-12-2017:09:43:26 |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes Transaction 6041885 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-10-2017:09:43:35 |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6041893 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-10-2017:09:44:36 |
|
March 20, 2017 | Hearing |
H185 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE D495 - Heard-Settled filed on: 03/20/2017 Extra Text: J.MCKAY/JAVS (DEPARTMENT 11) ORDER ENTERED. CLERK TO PREPARE ORDER ESTABLISHING CUSTODY & VISITATION Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
1327 - Case Mgt Conf Stmnt/Unmarried Extra Text: |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
1520 - Declaration DECLARATION OF SERVICE JUAN MATEOS 2/10/17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.