Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bardo, Terrence James filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHANNON, MASTER GREG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6908350 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-02-2018:17:04:12 |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
4300 - Withdrawal of Counsel W. Kathleen Baker and Kari Lepori Cordisco DA - Transaction 6908008 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 10-02-2018:17:02:09 |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5989886 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-10-2017:08:24:21 |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
3835 - Report... MEMO Re: Mediation - Transaction 5989776 - Approved By: TBRITTON : 03-10-2017:08:23:29 |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5968704 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-27-2017:12:01:24 |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
1945 - Master's Recommendation/Ord MASTER'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER - Transaction 5968697 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-27-2017:12:00:23 |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
February 07, 2017 | Hearing |
H353 - FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY D435 - Heard ... filed on: 02/07/2017 Extra Text: JAVS HEARING ROOM B nh Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5937437 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-07-2017:08:46:50 |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY 02/07/17 - Transaction 5937421 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-07-2017:08:43:41 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.