Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frazier, Martina Elise, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Johnson, Jason Demetrius, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Bridget E. Robb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridget E. Robb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryCu - Custody (Non-Divorce) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6365383 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-25-2017:15:57:14 |
|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
3897 - Return RETURNED MAIL - Transaction 6365242 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 10-25-2017:15:56:06 |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
3373 - Other ... RETURNED MAIL - Transaction 6228434 - Approved By: NMASON : 08-02-2017:13:37:11 |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6228451 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-02-2017:13:38:11 |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
2915 - Ord Dismissal w/o Prejudice ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Transaction 6195499 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-14-2017:08:10:34 |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6195500 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-14-2017:08:11:24 |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6182323 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-06-2017:14:47:29 |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
3373 - Other ... RETURNED MAIL - Transaction 6182170 - Approved By: TBRITTON : 07-06-2017:14:45:10 |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
3330 - Ord to Proceed ... Transaction 6042977 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-10-2017:14:00:19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.