Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grossman, Dixie filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Swift, Jason Joe, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Dixie R. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDixie R. Grossman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryCu - Custody (Non-Divorce) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6236385 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-07-2017:16:44:18 |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
2915 - Ord Dismissal w/o Prejudice Transaction 6236381 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-07-2017:16:43:28 |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
2697 - Ord After Case Mgt Conference ORDER TO PROCEED WITHIN 30 DAYS; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO D2 - Transaction 6009005 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-21-2017:09:39:35 |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6009008 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-21-2017:09:40:35 |
|
March 20, 2017 | Hearing |
H185 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE D480 - Heard-Not Settled filed on: 03/21/2017 Extra Text: Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
1740 - Financial Declaration ... Extra Text: |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
3609 - Pet/Est Custody & Visitation Extra Text: |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
1327 - Case Mgt Conf Stmnt/Unmarried Extra Text: |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
4090 - ** Summons Issued Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.