Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banales, Master Aimee filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTc - Tpo - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4474737 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-12-2014:15:12:04 |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
2590 - Notice Withdrawal of Attorney JOHN C. HOPE, JR., ESQ. / DARRELL KING - Transaction 4474448 - Approved By: MCHOLICO : 06-12-2014:15:11:12 |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4441451 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-21-2014:09:11:11 |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
4300 - Withdrawal of Counsel BONNIE MAHAN FOR PATTY WORTHINGTON - Transaction 4441090 - Approved By: YLLOYD : 05-21-2014:09:10:10 |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4373221 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-04-2014:09:31:55 |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes RE 02/13/14 EXT HRG - Transaction 4373217 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-04-2014:09:30:55 |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4304831 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-13-2014:14:39:35 |
|
February 13, 2014 | Hearing |
H332 - EXTENDED HEARING - NO CHILDREN D828 - TPO Ord Extended filed on: 02/13/2014 Extra Text: APPL W/COUNSEL; ADVP W/COUNSEL EXTENDED 6 MONTHS.............EXPIRES 08/13/14 @ 11:59 PM JAVS/HRG RM A GDAWSON Judge: . VACANT |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
1696 - Hrg Exhibits Maintnd in File ADVP EXHIBIT 1 MARKED AND ADMITTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.