Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banales, Master Aimee filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryTp - Req Temporary Protective Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes RE 01/15/14 EXT HRG - Transaction 4273460 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-24-2014:10:36:42 |
|
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4273468 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-24-2014:10:37:52 |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
1015 - Acknowledgment of Receipt Transaction 4258721 - Approved By: SHAMBRIG : 01-15-2014:13:17:09 |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4258887 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-15-2014:13:19:51 |
|
January 15, 2014 | Hearing |
H332 - EXTENDED HEARING - NO CHILDREN D382 - Dismissed TPO filed on: 01/15/2014 Extra Text: APPL PRO PER; ADVP PRO PER JAVS/HRG RM A GDAWSON Judge: MASTER BANALES |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
2700 - Ord After Hearing... Transaction 4258657 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-15-2014:11:49:51 |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4258700 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-15-2014:11:55:25 |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4226156 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-31-2013:08:22:46 |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
1520 - Declaration DECLARATION OF SERVICE - Transaction 4226104 - Approved By: AAKOPYAN : 12-31-2013:08:20:57 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.