Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banales, Master Aimee filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryTc - Tpo - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5344146 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-29-2016:11:00:05 |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
2700 - Ord After Hearing... APPL FTA - Transaction 5344144 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-29-2016:10:59:02 |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5327571 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-20-2016:11:23:34 |
|
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
1520 - Declaration OF NON-SERVICE - Transaction 5327441 - Approved By: RKWATKIN : 01-20-2016:11:22:42 |
|
January 19, 2016 | Hearing |
H328 - EXTENDED HEARING - CHILDREN D829 - TPO Denied Ord Extending filed on: 01/19/2016 Extra Text: PARTIES FTA NO RECORD Judge: . VACANT |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
2937 - Ord for Hrg to Ext/Mod/Dis TPO EXT HRG JANUARY 19, 2016 AT 10:00 A.M. - Transaction 5296592 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-29-2015:10:28:50 |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
1255 - Application for TPO Transaction 5296581 - Approved By: MTORRES : 12-29-2015:10:24:26 |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5296584 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-29-2015:10:27:21 |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5296595 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-29-2015:10:29:51 |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes PROTECTION ORDER WORKSHEET - Transaction 5296592 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-29-2015:10:28:50 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.