Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bullock, Shawn Michael filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with VACANT, . presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryTp - Req Temporary Protective Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
1067 - Affidavit of Service Extra Text: |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3457622 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-10-2013:16:56:45 |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes RE 01/07/13 EXT HRG - Transaction 3457587 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-10-2013:16:52:16 |
|
January 07, 2013 | Hearing |
H332 - EXTENDED HEARING - NO CHILDREN D828 - TPO Ord Extended filed on: 01/07/2013 Extra Text: APPL PRO PER; ADVP FTA EXTENDED ONE YEAR..........EXPIRES 01/07/13 @ 11:59 PM JAVS/HRG RM A GDAWSON Judge: . VACANT |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
1715 - Extended Protection Ord EXTENDED ONE YEAR.........EXPIRES 01/07/14 @ 11:59 PM |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
1255 - Application for TPO AFTER HOURS ISSUED 12/29/12 |
|
December 31, 2012 | Hearing |
H320 - HEARING ON EX PARTE FILING D425 - Granted filed on: 12/31/2012 Extra Text: AFTER HOURS TPO ISSUED 12/30/12 Judge: MASTER DOLLINGER |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
4165 - Temporary Protective Order AFTER HOURS EXT HRG 01/07/13 @ 10 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.