Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mitchell, Bobbi filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with VACANT, . presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryTp - Req Temporary Protective Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
1520 - Declaration DECLARATION OF SERVICE |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3524128 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-11-2013:13:34:17 |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
2842 - Ord Denying Motion ORDER DENYING EX PARTE MOTION TO DISSOLVE THE ORDER FOR PROTECTION - Transaction 3524118 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-11-2013:13:32:30 |
|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
2620 - Obj to Master's Recommendation OBJECTION TO MASTER'S RECOMMENDATIONS AND NOTICE TO SET |
|
February 07, 2013 | Hearing |
EX1 - EX-PARTE MOTION EX200 - Ex Parte Motion Complete filed on: 02/11/2013 Extra Text: Judge: . VACANT |
|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
1325 - ** Case Reopened Extra Text: |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes RE 01/29/13 EXT HRG - Transaction 3515844 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-06-2013:16:50:20 |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3515899 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-06-2013:16:58:02 |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.