Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wiedemer, Rachael Dawn filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Bridget E. Robb presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryCu - Custody (Non-Divorce) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7018034 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-11-2018:12:22:59 |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
2590 - Notice Withdrawal of Attorney JAMIE HENRY, ESQ. WITHDRAWS FROM JAMES WILSON - Transaction 7017511 - Approved By: PMSEWELL : 12-11-2018:12:21:56 |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6986647 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-20-2018:15:03:08 |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 6986334 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 11-20-2018:15:00:47 |
|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Extra Text: |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
2867 - Ord Estab Cust/Visitation... ORDER ESTABLISHING CUSTODY, VISITATION AND SUPPORT - Transaction 3436449 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-02-2013:09:53:30 |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
F250 - Setld/Withdrn w/o Jud Conf/Hrg Extra Text: |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3436457 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-02-2013:09:54:52 |
|
December 28, 2012 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 01/02/2013 Extra Text: ORDER ESTABLISHING CUSTODY, VISITATION AND SUPPORT Judge: BRIDGET ROBB |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
FCIS - Family Court Info Sheet Transaction 3431420 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-28-2012:09:06:25 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.