Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Berning, Esq., Kathrine Irene filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with VACANT, . presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryTc - Tpo - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3518840 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-07-2013:16:34:32 |
|
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes RE 01/29/13 EXT HRG - Transaction 3518823 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-07-2013:16:31:16 |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
1715 - Extended Protection Ord EXTENDED 6 MONTHS.............EXPIRES 07/29/13 @ 11:59 PM |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
January 29, 2013 | Hearing |
H328 - EXTENDED HEARING - CHILDREN D828 - TPO Ord Extended filed on: 01/29/2013 Extra Text: APPL W/COUNSEL;ADVP PRO PER EXTENDED 6 MONTHS............EXPIRES 07/29/13 @ 11:59 PM JAVS/HRG RM A GDAWSON Judge: . VACANT |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
2520 - Notice of Appearance KATHERINE I. BERNING, ESQ OBO CHANDRA LYNN COLLIER - Transaction 3482140 - Approved By: MFERNAND : 01-23-2013:10:52:38 |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3482378 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-23-2013:10:53:56 |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
1520 - Declaration DECLARATION OF SERVICE TIMOTHY COLLIER 12/27/12 |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
3385 - Personal Case Inf. UCCJEA Extra Text: |
|
December 27, 2012 | Hearing |
H320 - HEARING ON EX PARTE FILING D425 - Granted filed on: 12/27/2012 Extra Text: EXPARTE TPO INTERVIEW.............HRG RM A Judge: . VACANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.